Governing document BRAINTREE DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 JUN 2016 as amended on 09 Jun 2023 as amended on 09 Jun 2023 as amended on 26 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3. Objects 3.1 The objects of the Company (the “Objects”) are: (a) to recognise, preserve, interpret and promote Braintree District’s unique collections and the heritage of design, industry and natural history that are in its care of local, national and international significance, to stimulate design, creativity, industry, curiosity and inspiration for all generations worldwide by: (i) the development and maintenance of the museum named Braintree Museum for the interpretation and care of items of local or historic interest or value (the “Museum Collection”); and (ii) the development and maintenance of the archive named Warner Textile Archive for the interpretation and care of items of historic interest or value relating to the textile company and associated history of Warner & Sons Ltd, its predecessors and successors (the “Archive Collection”); and (iii) the creation, marketing and promotion of activities, displays, education, events, exhibitions, publications, research, related to culture and the Archive Collection and the Museum Collection.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRAINTREE, ESSEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.