THE PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF ST THOMAS CE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1110331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bags to school, snowman drive, raffles, sale of calenders, quiz, cake stalls, bingo night, sponsored events, disco, summer fun evening, coffee mornings, catalogue sales, donations, entry to competitions, commision from sales, tuck shop.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £10,039
Total expenditure: £11,009

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PTFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Miller Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Jessica Abba Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
REBECCA PRESTON Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.68k £3.94k £4.39k £6.81k £10.04k
Total expenditure £8.69k £3.29k £8.75k £4.45k £11.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 March 2022 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 March 2021 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Thomas C Of E School
Kendal Green
KENDAL
Cumbria
LA9 5PP
Phone:
07547854347
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available