BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF PLAY THERAPISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activities are to have a membership that is registered to ensure appropriate standards of Play Therapy training, continual professional development and supervision to protect the children, young people and adults and for the public benefit. We also have a website; accredit courses in Play Therapy;have a code of ethics;have an annual conference and provide publicity about our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 2006: Standard registration
- BAPT (Working name)
- THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF PLAY THERAPISTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanne McLaughlin | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Fearn | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Kilgallon | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Olaxi Murray | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Boyle | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lanigan | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Schencks | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Kelly | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Greenwood | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hill | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew O'Mahony | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.99k | £123.82k | £96.12k | £113.56k | £130.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.96k | £78.18k | £59.20k | £84.97k | £77.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 June 2021 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 June 2021 | 306 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED 23 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES BY PROMOTING THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PLAY THERAPY AND PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF PLAY THERAPY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cottons Chartered Accountants
1 Billing Road
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 5AL
- Phone:
- 07955204068
- Email:
- info@bapt.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window