SWADLINCOTE AND DISTRICT YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working within local schools and youth groups, providing life skills and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 July 2005: Standard registration
- SDYFC (Working name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE YOUTH FOR CHRIST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Joseph Worth | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Shakespeare | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Patrick John Douglas | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Reginald Smith | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Marie Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE HARDY | Trustee | 29 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY NIGEL PATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.43k | £42.53k | £30.62k | £26.51k | £38.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.93k | £37.79k | £22.08k | £26.17k | £34.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY 12 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2015
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN SOUTH DERBYSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN SOUTH DERBYSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS; C) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING; AND D) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gresley Church Community Centre
Church Street
Church Gresley
SWADLINCOTE
DE11 9NR
- Phone:
- 07584358576
- Email:
- helen.davis@yfc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window