PROJECT CALEB UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Project Caleb provides volunteer training facilitating: practical assistance to vulnerable young people eg liaison with colleges and assistance with application and enrolment; liaison with police and courts; delivery of life skills training; involvement with social and voluntary activities; liaison with potential employers and assistance with job applications; ongoing support after employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 2006: Standard registration
- 15 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- PROJECT CALEB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.13k | £62.08k | £62.08k | £116.94k | £54.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.97k | £51.91k | £51.91k | £90.42k | £62.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, THROUGHOUT THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, TRAINING AND OTHER ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING BENEFITS, HOUSING, EDUCATIONAL OR VOCATIONAL QUALIFICATIONS AND EMPLOYMENT AND BY SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window