GURU RAVIDASS EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives funds from member's subscriptions and donations from individuals and organisations. The beneficiaries are children or young persons from poor communities in India irrespective of their caste, religion or other distinction, for their education in India. Trustees give priority to those who have no chance to attend school due to severe poverty and award scholarships and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 10 October 2005: Standard registration
- GREAT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHARAN BUNGER MBE | Chair | 20 February 2005 |
|
|||||
Sushil Nand | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|||||
BANT SANDHU | Trustee | 20 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
HARMESH PAL | Trustee | 20 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
SATYA CHUMBER | Trustee | 20 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BALEY | Trustee | 20 February 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/02/2020 | 19/02/2021 | 19/02/2022 | 19/02/2023 | 19/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.42k | £15.51k | £7.30k | £7.52k | £13.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.42k | £13.77k | £14.04k | £20.15k | £33.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 February 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 February 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 February 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 February 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/2005 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN INDIA IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR CASTE, RELIGION OR OTHER DISTINCTION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, RELEVANT MEDICAL ASSISTANCE, BURSARIES FOR TEXTBOOKS, UNIFORMS AND THE PROVISION OF LIBRARY, NEW CLASS ROOM TEACHING FACILITIES AND INSTALLATION OF CLEAN WATER SYSTEMS IN REMOTE VILLAGE SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 ST. DAVIDS GROVE
BIRMINGHAM
B20 1BT
- Phone:
- 01215541570
- Email:
- great4education@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window