NEW LIFE DESTINY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 2005: Standard registration
- WORD OF LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- WORD OF LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN KASUVU | Trustee |
|
||||||
REV WALTER ORINDA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev LILIAN AKINYI ORINDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.87k | £28.44k | £34.99k | £58.16k | £98.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.09k | £32.35k | £29.27k | £44.11k | £83.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 24 MAY 2005 as amended on 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARMONDSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH
HIGH STREET
HARMONDSWORTH
WEST DRAYTON
UB7 0AH
- Phone:
- 02088976725
- Email:
- WLCFELLOWSHIP@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window