Financial history CHRIST CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1111919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £216.49k £299.88k £315.74k £280.08k £498.26k
Total expenditure £199.61k £209.60k £361.58k £253.93k £418.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A