SWAHILI SUPPORT NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
serving the swahili speaking diaspora in the u.k and eleviation of poverty in africa particularly in kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Kenya
Governance
- 24 November 2005: Standard registration
- 24 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- SWAHNET (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £850 | £950 | £1.10k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £850 | £950 | £1.10k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25TH NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29TH OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, ORPHANS AND WIDOWS FROM AFRICA AND THE KENYAN COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AFFECTED BY HIV, BY: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
AFRICA, KENYA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window