OFF CENTRE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE COMMUNITY OF MONMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND AMATEUR DRAMATICS BY THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, PLAYS AND OTHER DRAMATIC PRODUCTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME, TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 30 December 2005: Standard registration
- OCT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY MANNING | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Robert MacFarlane | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tom Rigby | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|||||
BARBARA PATRICIA SPENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE AMELIA MACFARLANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND BRIAN PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.09k | £4.60k | £8.72k | £14.38k | £40.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.11k | £6.91k | £12.51k | £10.16k | £15.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE COMMUNITY OF MONMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND AMATEUR DRAMATICS BY THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, PLAYS AND OTHER DRAMATIC PRODUCTIONS (2) FROM TIME TO TIME, TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
MONMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Duchess Road
Osbaston
MONMOUTH
NP25 3HT
- Phone:
- 01600715699
- Email:
- info@offcentretheatre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window