Trustees ABBEY FIELDS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1110668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Sharp | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Smith | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bradburn | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Bowyer | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Clark | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brooks | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Petchey | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH STURGEON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.