Accounts and annual returns THE CATHOLIC FUND FOR THE HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE

Charity number: 1110480
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 09 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 August 2006 On Time