AGE UK BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET LIMITED

Charity number: 1110455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(a) Information & Advice: drop-ins/appointments/outreach/home visiting (b) Day Centres & activities: art group/lunch clubs/trips/school link-up/reminiscence work/minibus transport (c) Home Services: Home from Hospital/Home Response/Toenail Cutting/Befriending (d) Walking for Health healthy living activities including tai chi, lunch bunch social group (e) Support Planning (f) Volunteering

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 2005: Standard registration
  • 13 March 2024: Funds received from 1175322 BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET DEMENTIA ACTION ALLIA...
  • 31 October 2024: Funds received from 1158654 CARE HOME VOLUNTEERS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AGE UK BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET LIMITED (Working name)
  • AGE CONCERN BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Louise Burns Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Robert Douglas Greig Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Lesley Margaret Entwistle Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
Roy Shubhabrata Trustee 19 August 2020
AGE UK
Received: On time
Patrick Anketell-Jones Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £923.50k £982.55k £1.17m £1.18m £1.35m
Total expenditure £902.97k £832.28k £900.64k £1.29m £1.52m
Income from government contracts £422.25k £20.00k N/A N/A £738.98k
Income from government grants N/A £23.30k £118.25k £18.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £164.24k £288.97k £551.65k £324.60k £300.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £20.03k £6.59k £2.85k £8.31k
Income - Charitable activities £755.81k £672.35k £613.82k £855.23k £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.45k £1.21k £23 £1.88k £7.90k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £19.11k £10.40k £270.94k £7.01k £110.13k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £856.38k £764.01k £838.58k £1.25m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.60k £68.26k £62.07k £34.26k £30.28k
Expenditure - Governance £2.89k £0 £10.13k £9.99k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.63k £6.33k £3.14k £19.99k £13.47k
Long-term investments £10 £1.21k £10 £10 £10
Other assets £419.34k £566.44k £845.82k £754.75k £734.41k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £48.30k £49.02k £52.57k £82.81k £228.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Studio
Alexander House
James Street West
BATH
BA1 2BT
Phone:
01225466135