Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF VECTIS SUNRISE (NEWPORT) ISLE OF WIGHT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1110561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 March 2025 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 October 2024 527 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 February 2023 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 July 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required