FISHING 4 WISHES EDWARD REVILL'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsored Walks up Ben Nevis, and personal donations from family and friends
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sutton
Governance
- 27 July 2005: Standard registration
- FISHING4WISHES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN HUNSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY CONFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £261 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £80 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF TEENAGE CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 13 AND 19 YEARS SUFFERING FROM CANCER THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Claremont Lane
Esher
KT10 9DT
- Phone:
- 01372470299
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window