ALOPECIA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alopecia UK provides impartial information, advice & support to those affected by alopecia. We raise awareness to the general public and healthcare professionals about alopecia and its psychological impact. We support medical and psychological researchers who aim to find effective treatments. We aim to create a sustainable funding stream to enable continued growth of Alopecia UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Moore | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manisha Chana | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Coombes | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Kelly | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kimberly Brown | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Lindsey | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hickinbotham | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Lynn Wilks | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £684.30k | £306.59k | £358.35k | £292.95k | £283.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.95k | £230.97k | £302.77k | £379.91k | £339.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £428.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £17.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £236.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £360.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £256.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09 APR 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21 AUG 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH ALOPECIA AREATA, ALOPECIA TOTALIS AND ALOPECIA UNIVERSALIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS BY THE PROVISIONS OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ALOPECIA AREATA, ALOPECIA TOTALIS AND ALOPECIA UNIVERSALIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS. 3. CONDUCTING AND COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO ALOPECIA AREATA, ALOPECIA TOTALIS AND ALOPECIA UNIVERSALIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alopecia UK
10-12 Commercial Street
Shipley
West Yorkshire
BD18 3SR
- Phone:
- 08001017025
- Email:
- info@alopecia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window