TARVIN PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £182,820 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 25 July 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Wood | Chair | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harrison | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faye Holden | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Aidley | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Binyon | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Johnstone | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pagan Young | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Radcliffe | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Perry | Trustee | 06 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Jackson | Trustee | 06 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.86k | £283.91k | £246.52k | £314.17k | £333.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.83k | £271.96k | £270.30k | £325.80k | £361.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £189.17k | £156.63k | £113.37k | £154.56k | £182.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN TH ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tarvin Nursery School
Heath Drive
Tarvin
CHESTER
CH3 8LS
- Phone:
- 01829741011
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window