NORTH SOUTH SOLUTIONS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2005: Standard registration
- 09 July 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 15 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING BUSINESS, MANAGEMENT AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SERVICES AND SYSTEMS TO VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES IN LOW TO MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES IN SOUTH AND CENTRAL AMERICA, THE CARIBBEAN, AFRICA AND ASIA FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: - A) RELIEVING THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR CIVIL DISASTERS; B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; C) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH; D) THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; F) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY; AND G) THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION. CHARITIES: ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window