EMMANUEL YOUTH PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emmanuel Youth Project works with young people aged 11-21. We offer youth work provison, an information and advice service, gangs work programme and training programmes. We work with hard to reach young people assisting them to access apprenticeships and employment opportunites. We are also developing an overseas project in the Gambia and plan to run a charity shop as part of this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- The Gambia
Governance
- 24 November 2005: Standard registration
- 10 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EMMANUEL YOUTH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- EMMANUEL YOUTH PROJECT LTD (Working name)
- EYP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 19/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.78k | £5.36k | £14.04k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.84k | £110.91k | £14.04k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 December 2017 | 11 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 August 2016 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE LEISURE AND RECREATION FACILITIES AND OTHER PROGRAMMES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT AND VARIED PROGRAMMES OF HIGH QUALITY YOUTH WORK, THROUGH WHICH YOUNG PEOPLE CAN IDENTIFY AND ADDRESS THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE NEEDS AND CONCERNS, AS WELL AS THOSE OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY. THUS ENABLING YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR CONFIDENCE, SELF ESTEEM, SKILLS AND ABILITIES, IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY MAKE INFORMED CHOICES, BECOME MORE CREATIVE AND MOVE TOWARDS FULFILLING THEIR POTENTIAL AND BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. 2) TO MAINTAIN AND OR ESTABLISH YOUTH PROJECTS WHETHER ALONE OF IN PARTNERSHIP WITH ANY OTHER BODY IN THE UK OR OVERSEAS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS..
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON, FOREST GATE AND MANOR PARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window