CRAZY HATS BREAST CANCER APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Northamptonshire based charity raising funds to financially support the breast care units at our two local hospitals in the county. Funds are raised through numerous activities and projects are costed and agreed with the hospitals before being granted. We also offer counselling and support sessions, therapy services and run a Holiday Home for patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 September 2005: Standard registration
- 28 January 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1165702 NORTHAMPTONSHIRE HEALTH CHARITABLE FUND
- 28 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1056804 LEICESTER HOSPITALS CHARITY
- 28 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1094646 NORTHAMPTONSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- CRAZY HATS (Working name)
- CRAZY HATS APPEAL (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.71k | £464.88k | £180.55k | £145.25k | £83.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.96k | £293.04k | £174.89k | £191.97k | £44.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 21 December 2019 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 06 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 16 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 18 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND LEICESTERSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window