Financial history THE SOUTH ATLANTIC MEDAL ASSOCIATION (1982) (SAMA 82)

Charity number: 1118842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £72.12k £101.18k £154.39k £64.40k £91.05k
Total expenditure £43.82k £39.92k £93.46k £55.44k £52.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A