DR JAZZ CHARITABLE FUNDS

Charity Number: 1111573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We continue to raise funds for charitable purposes. In the past year we have donated funds to worthy charities. We look forward to further success and helping more needy causes in the future.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £1,825
Total expenditure: £1,558

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DOCTOR JAZZ CHARITABLE FUNDS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR PAUL RICHARD GODDARD Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR HUGH BERESFORD COAKHAM Trustee
None on record
LOIS MARY GODDARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £3.25k £799 £1.35k £1.91k £1.83k
Total expenditure £4.11k £535 £2.26k £1.88k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 11 March 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 March 2024 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 March 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
REDLAND GREEN FARM
REDLAND GREEN
BRISTOL
BS6 7HF
Phone:
07836503999