NORTHAMPTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE OF SCOUTING IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
496 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 27 July 2005: Standard registration
- 01 March 2017: Funds received from 304411 31ST NORTHAMPTON (SHIPMAN HOME) SCOUT GROUP
- NORTHAMPTON DISTRICT SCOUTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Brooker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Claris | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BEN OUSLEY | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Malcomson | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LOMAS | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.94k | £153.59k | £206.29k | £202.01k | £217.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.44k | £133.54k | £176.30k | £203.39k | £229.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £58.74k | £27.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FERNIE FIELDS SCOUT
AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
FERNIE FIELD
MOULTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 7BD
- Phone:
- 01604646460
- Email:
- dc@northamptonscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window