KENT MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kent Music is the lead partner for the music education hub for Kent. We provide instrumental & vocal tuition, ensembles, choirs and groups for children, young people & adults, bespoke support to schools, a financial assistance scheme to support children & young people on low incomes and a musical instrument service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£4,773,501
Donations and legacies | £13.26k | |
Charitable activities | £4.71m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £46.26k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,225,666
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.23m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,693,938 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.23m | |
Retained for future use | £1.55m |
People

126 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 29 July 2005: Standard registration
- KENT MUSIC SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF MILES | Chair | 07 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Heulwen Finley | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABDUR-REHMAN ISMAEL-MIA | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hamilton | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Kyle Siwek | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alicia Moyles | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Cooling | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Evernden | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN HAMMERTON | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH TOPIWALA | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY PHILIP LEATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89m | £2.98m | £3.23m | £4.23m | £4.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.98m | £2.88m | £3.20m | £3.12m | £3.23m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.34m | £2.49m | £2.39m | £3.29m | £3.69m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.47k | £16.40k | £3.64k | £10.08k | £13.26k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.89m | £2.96m | £3.22m | £4.21m | £4.71m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.13k | £2.53k | £1.44k | £10.43k | £46.26k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £129 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.98m | £2.88m | £2.34m | £3.12m | £3.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £860.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £15.60k | £18.80k | £0 | £17.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £501.95k | £484.63k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £154.38k | £117.81k | £86.29k | £123.44k | £10.26k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £152.48k | |
|
Other assets | £3.00m | £3.13m | £3.19m | £4.47m | £5.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£739.00k | -£476.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £174.74k | £182.55k | £206.21k | £434.64k | £433.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2011 as amended on 22 Jun 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') SHALL BE THE PROMOTION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS IN ALL ITS FORMS AND IN PARTICULAR MUSIC AND FOR THIS PURPOSE TO PROVIDE EDUCATION TUITION AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF KENT, INCLUDING THE MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kent Music
Unit 25-26
Creative Enterprise Quarter
Javelin Way
ASHFORD
TN24 8FN
- Phone:
- 01622691212
- Email:
- rroberts@kent-music.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window