GREATER MANCHESTER MOULVIBAZAR DISTRICT WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
helping the community to better their lives with means of support. ie english classes, training for better jobs, community trips and events, sporting events. english for elderly people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Tameside
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 14 September 2005: Standard registration
- GMMDWA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
sheikh mohammed kamal uddin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
sawkat elahi choudhury | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
faruque ahmed | Trustee | 01 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
RUHUL AMIN CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MAZADUL ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £4.14k | £4.02k | £4.92k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £3.95k | £4.02k | £4.92k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 20TH JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 21ST AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
I. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN TAMESIDE AND GREATER MANCHESTER (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES IN ENGLISH AND BENGALI AS SECOND LANGUAGES, AND BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON OTHER EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY AVAILABLE IN THE AREA. II. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIPS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE RELATING TO LOCAL AND NATIONAL SERVICES, BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH ISSUES AND IMMIGRATION, AND BY THE PROVISION OF A TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETATION SERVICE. III. THE PROVISION, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
TAMESIDE AND GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Dairyground Road
Bramhall
STOCKPORT
SK7 2QW
- Phone:
- 07944604235
- Email:
- moulvibazarasson@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window