LEARN ORG UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help tackle current community issues (Digital Divide, Integration, Isolation, Environment, Health & Well Being, Youth (NEET) & Unemployment) in areas of deprivation. Reaching out to the 'hard to reach' communities and those facing exclusion or barriers (BME communities, Women & Girls, & Youth) by creating, developing, and delivering innovative learning, social & Enterprise projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Egypt
- India
- Italy
- Malaysia
- Portugal
- Spain
- Sweden
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 01 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHEER LAHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stefania De Zorzi | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Maria Manuela LOPES TAVARES | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF MAYET | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.22k | £90.11k | £26.98k | £72.42k | £35.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.26k | £28.51k | £23.55k | £36.10k | £74.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE NORTH KIRKLEES WARD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A NEIGHBOURHOOD LEARNING CENTRE DELIVERING A RANGE OF LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER PROVIDERS.
Area of benefit
NORTH KIRKLEES WARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIRKLEES COUNCIL
BRETTON STREET ENTERPRISE CENTRE
BRETFIELD COURT
UNIT 12
DEWSBURY
WEST YOR
- Phone:
- 01924462393
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window