JINGHPAW EDUCATION PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing teaching resources and professional advice. Contributing towards students' education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
- Burma
Governance
- 31 August 2005: Standard registration
- JEP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER BROWN | Chair | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon Brown | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Southwood | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BROWN | Trustee | 26 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA BROWN | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH CASTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOIS KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN CHARLES KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.60k | £22.61k | £10.71k | £29.65k | £17.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.73k | £27.99k | £18.35k | £26.39k | £20.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 6 AUGUST 2005 as amended on 01 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
To advance the education of persons in northern Myanmar, by the provision or assistance in the provision of educational facilities equipment, sponsorship, financial assistance and such other facilities as the trustees shall deem necessary with the object of improving their conditions of life and so as to assist them to realise their full potential as individuals and members of society.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Hillside Road
BUSHEY
WD23 2HB
- Phone:
- 07876101564
- Email:
- JEPeducation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window