THE REFUGEE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give support to asylum seekers/refugees who are not in receipt of state benefits or any other financial support in order to keep them from destitution. We also provide advice and welfare and other support where appropriate to asylum seekers/refugees in the East Sussex area or those with a connection to East Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 21 October 2005: Standard registration
- 02 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £1.37k | £1.37k | £1.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 22ND JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS, THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE LIVING TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY IN THE EAST SUSSEX AREA OR AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES WHO HAVE A CONNECTION WITH THE EAST SUSSEX AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE, GUIDANCE AND ADVICE OR BY SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window