HUAXIA CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in particular those of Chinese ethnic origin in the Chinese language and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS X TENG | Chair | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Wong | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shixiong Guo | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yonghui Song | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr LIQUN ZHANG | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINGLIN CAO | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NA LI | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUJUN YIN | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.53k | £32.26k | £86.42k | £78.73k | £106.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.56k | £42.98k | £51.73k | £66.56k | £75.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2021
(These accounts |
19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF CHINESE ETHNIC ORIGIN IN THE CHINESE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 LANSDOWNE ROAD
SALE
M33 6PF
- Phone:
- 07809256762
- Email:
- admin@huaxiaschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window