DUNSTABLE AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving free advice on clients rights and responsibilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 01 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Coulter | Chair | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carol Brennan | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Watson | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Morris | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thorne | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Kane | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Syred | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.63k | £182.55k | £178.30k | £230.08k | £264.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.67k | £176.42k | £183.98k | £182.99k | £217.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £99.14k | N/A | £103.28k | £142.49k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2005. as amended on 15 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN DUNSTABLE AND SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
DUNSTABLE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dunstable Centre
Court Drive
DUNSTABLE
BEDS
LU5 4JD
- Phone:
- 01582665629
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window