AFRICAN EUROPEAN FAMILY NETWORK (AEFAN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are meeting once a month on Sunday.We are still planning to open a preschool in Africa. We are also working on creating a magazine promoting African culture in Europe. We are planning to create a group of African restaurants and businesses to come together to get administrative help for theirs business needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2005: Standard registration
- AEFAN (Working name)
- AFRICAN EUROPEAN FAMILIES INTEGRATION (Working name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rees Seaka | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Oppong Annor | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Owusu Annor | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fouley TRAORE | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GASSY TRAORE | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 May 2023 | 438 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 May 2023 | 803 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 3RD SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY BETWEEN MEMBERS OF AFRICAN AND EUROPEAN COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE UK AND EUROPE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITIES WHO ARE REFUGEES OR ASYLUM SEEKERS, BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, MULTI-CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE BY THE PROMOTION OF GOOD RACE RELATIONS, ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE, NATIONALITY OR ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY GENERALLY. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES OF AFRICAN ORIGIN WITHIN THE UK AND EUROPE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THOSE WHO ARE ASYLUM SEEKERS OR REFUGEES, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT IN ACCESSING TRAINING, EDUCATIONAL AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES, HEALTH CARE AND BENEFITS.
Area of benefit
UK AND EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Lower Addiscombe Road
CROYDON
CR0 6PT
- Phone:
- 07598410163
- Email:
- gassyt@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window