RISELEY, SWALLOWFIELD AND FARLEY HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2005: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 February 2013: Re-registered
- RSF CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERESA MARIA EAGLES | Chair | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Waterer | Trustee | 16 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Taylor | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Rourke | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Anley | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Coulter | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE FIRTH | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MARIAN BAILEY | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.86k | £1.19k | £3.20k | £2.51k | £2.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.19k | £321 | £1.29k | £3.08k | £2.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY INSTEAD OF THEMSELVES SO PAYING OR APPLYING ANY OF THE SAID INCOME OR CAPITAL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION PAY OR TRANSFER THE SAME TO ANY CHARITY OR CHARITIES (WHETHER INCORPORATED OR NOT AND INCLUDING NOT ONLY EXISTING CHARITIES BUT ALSO SUCH NEW CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ESTABLISH) EITHER FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR ANY SPECIFIC CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OF, OR CONNECTED WITH, SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YEWTREE FARM
PART LANE
SWALLOWFIELD
READING
RG7 1TB
- Phone:
- 07973307721
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window