TUBBS TURF MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tubbs Turf Management Committee is a charity formed to manage and run Tubbs Turf, a small multi sports and recreational facility within the village of Kingswood Gloucestershire. The charity's main function is is to maintain the facility for the benefit of the residents of the Parish of Kingswood Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
kit Morgan | Chair | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Catmull | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Messer | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Charles Bennett | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Catmull | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Martha Rogers | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Simon Davies | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Langdon | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Aldridge | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith Miller | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £4.28k | £6.04k | £5.55k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83k | £620 | £8.72k | £2.13k | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST EXECUTED 12 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND AND GARDENS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KINGSWOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR THE PLAYING OF BALL GAMES, COACHING OR OTHER APPROPRIATE FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AS APPROVED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE CHARITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KINGSWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Holywell Road
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 7NJ
- Phone:
- 01453 843301
- Email:
- admin@tubbsturf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window