OAK LODGE FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity mainly consist of holding fund raising events within the school and donating funds to the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
Governance
- 06 March 2006: Standard registration
- OAK LODGE FSA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Barber | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Philpot | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andre Coulloupas | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mitchell | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Kenton | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Behagg | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Davina Soochit | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Courtnell-Shaw | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Goggin | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Thompson | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Noble | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.73k | £12.41k | £11.89k | £42.03k | £49.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.85k | £3.06k | £12.83k | £48.35k | £40.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2023 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED AT AN EXTRAORDINARY GENERAL MEETING DATED 12 JANUARY 2006. AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2013 as amended on 10 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH ENHANCE THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, DEVELOPMENT AND WELLBEING OF THE PUPILS; AND 3. SUPPORTING THE SCHOOL IN RAISING FUNDS FOR EXTERNAL CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: BROMLEY, GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak Lodge Primary School
Chamberlain Crescent
WEST WICKHAM
BR4 0LJ
- Phone:
- 02088196996
- Email:
- oaklodgefsa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window