THE YIRGAALEM APPEAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty in the Sidamo region of Southern Ethiopia by ensuring that as many children receive an education by funding the building of, and the maintenance of a school in the town of Yirgaalem. The trust supports the school by funding equipment The trust works with youth groups in the region to support many homeless children by providing shelter, adult support , food and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 01 September 2005: Standard registration
- THE CHILDREN OF YIRGAALEM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark lumsden- taylor | Chair | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Kaj Gunner Erikson-Lee | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Georgia May Shelford | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Evans | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Charlton | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREJE GELETA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £144 | £685 | £144 | £2.46k | £144 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 2005. as amended on 27 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE CHILDREN ATTENDING AND WISHING TO ATTEND THE YIRGAALEM ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS IN THE SOUTHERN REGION OF ETHIOPIA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDING AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, THEREBY ENABLING THE SAID CHILDREN TO ACCESS EDUCATION AND COMPLETE THEIR HIGHER EDUCATION; (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THE YOUNG IN ETHIOPIA; (3) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES REGARD AS APPROPRIATE IN ASSISTING CHILDREN AND OTHER VULNERABLE GROUPS OF THE SOCIETY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONE COTTAGE
LOWER ROAD
EAST FARLEIGH
MAIDSTONE
ME15 0EU
- Phone:
- 07768352414
- Email:
- glyn.charlton1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window