Financial history ERIN GO BRAGH DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1111015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.40k £76.58k £57.75k £57.46k £59.22k
Total expenditure £55.08k £52.67k £49.32k £51.22k £47.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.27k £60.16k £35.00k £35.00k £35.00k