SUTTON GREEN PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's disco, family bingo, summer and christmas fayres, Sports days, movies for children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 05 August 2005: Standard registration
- 13 April 2016: Funds received from 1078862 LITTLE GREENS PRE-SCHOOL
- 11 October 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £192.24k | £4.08k | £3.89k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £15.08k | £5.27k | £5.52k | £111 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 October 2019 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 03 October 2019 | 95 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window