NEWTON PREP PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE PTA (A REGISTERED CHARITY) ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHILDREN'S EDUCATION JOINTLY WITH THE HEADMISTRESS AND SCHOOL COUNCIL; TO RAISE MONEY FOR THE NEWTON PREP SCHOLARSHIP FUND; TO DEVELOP EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDE FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steffen Goelkel | Chair | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
James Wallis | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle De Voe | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karine Neri | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Malavika Joymilind Patankar | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meg Clemency Stevenson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr FAROUK WALJI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.26k | £13.26k | £36.46k | £45.18k | £57.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.12k | £2.96k | £17.63k | £37.03k | £24.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE HEADTEACHER AND THE SCHOOL COUNCIL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NEWTON PREP,LONDON SW8.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWTON PREPARATORY SCHOOL
149 BATTERSEA PARK ROAD
LONDON
SW8 4BX
- Phone:
- 02077204091
- Email:
- danielle.l.devoe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window