ST AUGUSTINE'S NURSERY HIGHBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Augustines prepares children for entry into formal education by helping them gain confidence and interest in learning. Through group activities, free play and large group lessons, children are encouraged to develop new skills and interests, a love of learning and an enquiring mind. We provide a relaxed and happy environment where each child is valued and allowed to develop at their own pace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,780 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 05 August 2005: Standard registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S NURSERY (Working name)
- ST AUGUSTINE'S NURSERY HIGHBURY (Previous name)
- ST AUGUSTINE'S PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- ST AUGUSTINE'S PLAYGROUP HIGHBURY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH ROBERTS | Chair | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN PAUL WILSON | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JORDEN MACGREGOR | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda kathleen Near | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jasmine White | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.54k | £91.42k | £81.07k | £72.43k | £123.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.39k | £75.62k | £79.75k | £88.61k | £103.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.36k | £71.36k | £65.42k | £45.69k | £74.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HIGHBURY, ISLINGTON, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 HIGHBURY NEW PARK
LONDON
N5 2DR
- Phone:
- 02077048003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window