THE NORWOOD GREEN VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To own and maintain the village hall in Norwood Green for the benefit of the residents. To let the village hall to private individuals and organisations for suitable activities. To maintain and improve public amenities in the village of Norwood Green, with any surplus income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 05 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Claire Phillips | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Crystal Marshall | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abbe Gordziejko | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kizzy Cook | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rustom | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Clamp | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin William Vesely | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA CLAIRE WEBB | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK DENT | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.65k | £23.25k | £8.02k | £12.97k | £9.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.14k | £9.53k | £6.07k | £10.96k | £9.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TO ALSO AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES APPLY ANY SURPLUS INCOME FROM THE TRUST FUND FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PUBLIC AMENITIES WITHIN THE VILLAGE OF NORWOOD GREEN, INCLUDING THE ELLIS COURT CLOCK TOWER, THE VILLAGE GREENS AND THE CHILDREN’S PLAY AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORWOOD GREEN, WEST YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NORWOOD GREEN VILLAGE
HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
THE NORWOOD GREEN VILLAGE HALL
VILLAGE STREET
NORWOOD GREEN
HALIFAX
- Phone:
- 07772661326
- Email:
- kizzy@hairbykizzy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window