IRANIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Normal Church Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 November 2005: Standard registration
- ICF (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MEHRDAD FATEHI | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MALCOLM STUART STEER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Rev SAMUEL BAZMJOU | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Rev MANSOUR BORJI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr CHARLES GOGBASHIAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.78k | £44.85k | £58.75k | £79.94k | £99.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.68k | £71.08k | £43.62k | £80.99k | £71.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1964 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING AT ARTICLE 4. WE ARE COMMITTED TO THE GREAT COMMISSION OF MT 28:19, 20, IN EVANGELISTIC OUTREACH TO, AND DISCIPLING OF IRANIANS AND OTHERS, FIRSTLY IN THE UK, AND THEN EUROPE AND ELSEWHERE IN COOPERATION WITH OTHERS OF LIKE VISION..
Area of benefit
THE UK, EUROPE AND ELSWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IRANIAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
158 SUTTON COURT ROAD
LONDON
W4 3HR
- Phone:
- 02089954966
- Email:
- info@icfonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window