Accounts and annual returns THE CONSTANT GARDENER TRUST

Charity number: 1111042
Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 March 2022 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required