Financial history PARKWATER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1110800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £216.71k £231.94k £107.52k £406.45k £433.75k
Total expenditure £100.87k £96.09k £137.01k £137.58k £180.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A