THE STAFFORD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is: 1. To relieve the suffering and distress of animals in need of care and attention, in particular, but not exclusively, the breed of dog known as the Staffordshire Bull Terrier by the provision of veterinary care, shelter and re-homing services of such animals. 2. To advance the education of the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB WHITTALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Rigg | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BLACKMORE | Trustee | 27 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LIESL GARRETT | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewat Hamilton Rhodes | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MARIE MURRAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £4.19k | £3.74k | £9.27k | £7.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.32k | £2.74k | £858 | £280 | £575 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2024 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 24TH APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE BREED OF DOG KNOWN AS THE STAFFORDSHIRE BULL TERRIER BY THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY CARE, SHELTER AND RE-HOMING SERVICES OF SUCH ANIMALS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 ABBOTS VUE
BACKBARROW
ULVERSTON
LA12 8RA
- Phone:
- 01539530245
- Email:
- bobsbtrescue@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window