FAITHFUL NEIGHBOURS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the benefit of the public in the promotion of reconciliation and peace by establishing a Christian understanding of the issues of life in a multi-faith and multi-cultural society within the Bradford Metropolitan District and elsewhere by enabling the people of Bradford and other communities to develop their understanding of issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 2005: Standard registration
- 04 November 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 04 November 2020: Funds transferred to 1179481 WELLSPRINGS TOGETHER
- BCDD (Working name)
- BRADFORD CHURCHES FOR DIALOGUE AND DIVERSITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.45k | £169.73k | £201.34k | £134.22k | £71.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.11k | £170.91k | £173.72k | £111.54k | £55.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/08/2015
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROMOTION OF RECONCILIATION AND PEACE BY ESTABLISHING A CHRISTIAN UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES RELATING TO LIFE IN A MULTI-FAITH AND MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY WITHIN THE BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE; 3.2 TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AND MORE WIDELY, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE WHO LIVE IN THE AREA TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION AND ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window