PINNACLE HOUSING FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Creating awareness of using social Housing and related services as tool to help the poor. 2. Fundraising to support projects in Africa, currently in Ghana. 3. Recruiting members to support the social housing project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
Governance
- 26 September 2005: Standard registration
- 13 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- PHF UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £677 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.77k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING IN GHANA AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA TO PROVIDE HEALTHY LIVING ACCOMMODATION AND IMPROVEMENT IN THE QUALITY OF FAMILY LIFE
Area of benefit
GHANA AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window