ABACUS NURSERY AND CHILDCARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides high quality education and childcare. Abacus operates a term time nursery for 2 to 4 year olds, alongside Breakfast and After School Clubs for 2 to 11 year olds. As recognised by our Ofsted classification and award of the Kent Early Years Quality mark, Abacus is committed to supporting individual children and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £155,526 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 03 October 2005: Standard registration
- ST NICHOLAS EARLY YEARS AND CHILDCARE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Howard | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dale | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna LOCKE | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Singfield | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|||||
LISA JAYNE EVANS | Trustee | 10 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.43k | £247.21k | £402.49k | £236.79k | £283.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £421.17k | £155.28k | £391.78k | £254.24k | £286.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £155.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 August 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 August 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2012
Charitable objects
3(A) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS; AND 3(B) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 11 DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND HOLIDAYS; AND 3(C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abacus Nursery
Craythorne Lane
NEW ROMNEY
TN28 8BL
- Phone:
- 01797369287
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window