SRI LANKA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORKING MAINLY WITH THE SRI LANKAN COMMUNITY LIVING IN SLOUGH AREA TO IMPROVE AND INTEGRATE OUR COMMUNITY WITH THE HOST COMMUNITY. PROVIDING THE FACILITIES TO MEET SOCIO, CULTURAL AND RELIGIOUS REQUIREMENTS OF THE LOCAL MUSLIM COMMUNITY. FOR THIS PURPOSE WE HAVE ESTABLISHED MASJID AL-JANNAH: ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL & COMMUNITY CENTRE AT 1, STOKE ROAD SLOUGH BERKSHIRE SL25AH, SINCE MARCH 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£786,048
Donations and legacies | £386.94k | |
Charitable activities | £397.47k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.64k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£509,815
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £509.82k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £509.82k | |
Retained for future use | £276.23k |
People

26 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 26 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Rihan Jabbar | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nuskey Mohamed Nasrudeen | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Junaid Mohamed Siddique | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED IHTHISHAM | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED JANOOFAR BATHURUSAMAN | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sakkaf | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED AASIR MOHAMED AKRAM | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL HAMEED ANVERDEEN | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
NAZEER MARZOOK | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ABDULLAH AMEEN | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|||||
MOHAMED AKRAM ABDUL AZEEZ | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANEES MOHAMED | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED UZAIR MOHAMED OMERDEEN | Trustee | 05 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
RIZWAN RAMEES | Trustee | 05 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
HAKEEL MOHAMED | Trustee | 05 September 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £340.17k | £180.82k | £332.52k | £609.83k | £786.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.86k | £181.59k | £290.61k | £354.86k | £509.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £315.57k | £386.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £294.06k | £397.47k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £199 | £1.64k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £354.86k | £509.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £266.47k | £6.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | £1.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £457.29k | £372.23k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £169.71k | £300.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 10 DECEMBER 2006 AND 2 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH WITH THE BOROUGH OF SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITHIN THE AREAS OF BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY, ARTS, BELIEFS, LANGUAGES AND PEOPLES OF ISLAM AND THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, LECTURES AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH, UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 STOKE ROAD
SLOUGH
BERKSHIRE
SL2 5AH
- Phone:
- 01753315618
- Email:
- sloughaljannah@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window