SHAJEREH TOOBA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and sickness, and the advancement of education amongst orphaned children in UK, USA, Japan caused by natural disasters, crises and such other facilities as the trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 May 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Iraq
Governance
- 23 May 2006: Standard registration
- THE SHAJEREH TOOBA CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS ABBASZADI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marjan Shirak | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAAED YARF-ABBASI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/05/2013 | 22/05/2014 | 22/05/2015 | 22/05/2016 | 22/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.63k | £111.94k | £128.22k | £85.20k | £75.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.42k | £123.34k | £121.04k | £85.10k | £70.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Annual return | 22 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Annual return | 22 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days | |
Annual return | 22 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1144 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1144 days | |
Annual return | 22 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1509 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
(3.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AMONGST ORPHANED CHILDREN IN KARBALA, IRAQ BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ORPHANAGE AND SUCH OTHER FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. (3.2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN KARBALA, IRAQ. (3.3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KARBALA, IRAQ THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KARBALA, IRAQ.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 The Green
SOUTHGATE
LONDON
N14 7AB
- Phone:
- 07949675784
- Email:
- info@shajerehtooba.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window