NEWTOWN COMMUNITY LEARNING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides daycare and holiday club places and manages facilities on Newtown school campus for the benefit of the local community. It is also a main partner in Carlisle West Children's Centre which develops family services in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £104,443 from 12 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 March 2006: Standard registration
- NCLC (Working name)
- NEWTON CAMPUS (Working name)
- CARLISLE WEST CHILDREN'S CENTRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN ROBERTSON | Chair | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Samantha King | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheryll Marie Dickman | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.97k | £234.23k | £222.60k | £233.08k | £256.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.49k | £164.34k | £197.00k | £221.06k | £252.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £167.77k | £189.46k | £131.19k | £133.64k | £104.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWTOWN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WEST CARLISLE, CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST STEPS DAY NURSERY
NEWTOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL
NEWTOWN ROAD
CARLISLE
CA2 7LW
- Phone:
- 01228522249
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window